Accounts and annual returns EMS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1167498
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 June 2024 17 April 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2024 17 April 2025 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2023 27 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2023 27 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2022 05 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2021 11 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2020 04 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2020 04 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window