THE SEAN EDWARDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sean Edwards Foundation is a nonprofit organisation focused on raising safety awareness in motor sport. We work directly with drivers, teams and tracks to conceive and implement risk mitigation initiatives throughout all levels of racing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Italy
- Monaco
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 25 July 2017: Standard registration
- SEF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAPHNE CAROLINE EDWARDS | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ALEXANDER LITTLEJOHN | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER BRYANT | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.25k | £41.71k | £9.31k | £30.23k | £8.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.25k | £41.71k | £9.31k | £30.23k | £8.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2023 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2023 | 233 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2023 | 595 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES BY: (1) PROMOTING THE SAFETY OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC SPECTATING AT OR PARTICIPATING IN MOTOR SPORT OF ANY TYPE AT ANY AND ALL LEVELS OF DRIVER EXPERIENCE OR QUALIFICATION (INCLUDING THOSE WITH NONE) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (A) PROMOTING MOTOR SPORT SAFETY EDUCATION AND TESTING TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC DRIVING AT PUBLIC RACING CIRCUITS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND (B) PROMOTING IMPROVED SAFETY STANDARDS FOR PUBLIC RACING CIRCUITS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Regus
239 Kensington High Street
LONDON
W8 6SN
- Phone:
- 08009172520
- Email:
- Pa@seanedwardsfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window