ORANGUTAN VETERINARY AID (OVAID)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides medicines, equipment and veterinary mentoring to the various orangutan rescue groups and orangutan rehabilitation centres operating in Malaysia and Indonesia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Indonesia
- Malaysia
Governance
- 13 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR NIGEL COLIN HICKS BVSC MRCVS | Chair | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Montclare | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip McKinnon | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
HETTY LEWIS | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY ROSEMARY BAGNALL | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
LISA BURTENSHAW | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARA CAROLINE FELL HICKS B.A. HONS | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NOEL BRICKMAN | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.29k | £31.97k | £30.34k | £37.11k | £52.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.32k | £20.55k | £20.49k | £57.86k | £56.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF THE WILD ORANGUTAN IN ITS NATURAL HABITAT, TO PROMOTE ITS LONG TERM WELFARE AND TO PROTECT IT FROM EXTINCTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE STUDY, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE WILD ORANGUTAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 St. Thomas Hill
LAUNCESTON
PL15 8BL
- Phone:
- 01566 772076
- Email:
- info@ovaid.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window