HIGHWORTH YOUTH NEXUS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The project provides a mentoring service within the local secondary school , Warneford Academy. A multisports session is also available at the local leisure center. The young people attending have access to trained Strengthsnet based mentors available within the school day and during lunch breaks on the playground. Community outreach work also takes place.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
Governance
- 09 August 2016: CIO registration
- 13 March 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 13 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1080002 HIGHWORTH COMMUNITY CHURCH
- NEXUS YOUTH CAFE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.76k | £19.54k | £19.27k | £10.88k | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.04k | £18.60k | £16.53k | £9.45k | £2.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11-16 LIVING IN HIGHWORTH BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window