FRESHBROOK CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church provides activities for different age groups within the community, meeting specific needs, establishing contacts and building relationships. There are groups for children and young people, parents and toddlers, day-time groups for older people and a seniors lunch club held monthly. Outreach programmes in local schools operate both independently and collaboratively with other agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Swindon
Governance
- 20 June 2016: CIO registration
- 31 October 2016: Funds received from 1128374 FRESHBROOK EVANGELICAL CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID DAVISON | Chair | 30 June 2005 |
|
|||||
Philip Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CULLIS | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Laura Wood | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Nigel Bennett | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Davison | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Cox | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA ANN COX | Trustee | 31 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND CHEUNG | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK DAVID WOOD | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.74k | £186.11k | £205.10k | £210.87k | £248.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.39k | £164.99k | £177.91k | £190.08k | £201.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £679 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 20 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN SWINDON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE TEACHING OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OFFICE
FRESHBROOK CHURCH
WORSLEY ROAD
SWINDON
SN5 8NU
- Phone:
- 01793873050
- Email:
- office@freshbrook.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window