DURHAM CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are part of the nationwide City of Sanctuary movement. Based in County Durham, we work to build opportunities for introductions and friendship between sanctuary seekers and local people, helping new arrivals to integrate into our communities. Our aim is to create a culture of welcome for people seeking sanctuary from war and persecution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 01 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SUSAN FRANCES FRENK | Chair | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julius Radziunas | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fadia Faqir | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Wilkinson | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Amna Al Ali | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Iman Hafez Malouhi | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Herbert Simpson | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Nelli Stavropolou | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
TANYA PATRICIA DEVEREUX | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.97k | £7.85k | £18.40k | £59.62k | £19.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.06k | £11.53k | £19.79k | £25.72k | £32.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.50k | £3.08k | N/A | £6.51k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST ASYLUM-SEEKERS AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS IN DURHAM, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND ASYLUM-SEEKERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROMOTING THE INCLUSION, INTEGRATION AND WELFARE OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM-SEEKERS, BY ENCOURAGING A PUBLIC COMMITMENT TO BECOMING A PLACE OF WELCOME AND SAFETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT; B) ENCOURAGING, SUPPORTING AND LIAISING WITH DURHAM COUNTY COUNCIL, OTHER SERVICE PROVIDERS, LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND VOLUNTARY, COMMUNITY AND FAITH ORGANISATIONS IN WELCOMING AND ASSISTING REFUGEES AND ASYLUM-SEEKERS; AND C) PROVIDING ACCURATE AND UP TO DATE INFORMATION TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY ON THE SITUATION OF LOCAL REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND TO PUBLICISE AND CELEBRATE THEIR CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES, AND TO UK SOCIETY AND CULTURE, AND TO CHALLENGE HOSTILITY AND DISCRIMINATION AGAINST THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Aidans College
Windmill Hill
Durham
DH1 3LJ
- Phone:
- 0191 3345769
- Website:
-
durham.cityofsanctuary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window