Financial history HAVANT & WATERLOOVILLE SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1173746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £203.70k £123.54k £126.16k £177.05k £177.78k
Total expenditure £191.28k £130.26k £119.15k £166.14k £168.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A