Financial history HORNSBY HOUSE SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1167799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £171.89k £31.72k £21.14k £59.37k £46.38k
Total expenditure £169.60k £30.39k £20.70k £58.08k £46.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A