HORNSBY HOUSE SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School PTA raises money for local, national and international charities together with donations to the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 23 June 2016: Standard registration
- HHS PTA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Iles | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Keable | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Kassam | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sullivan | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tutu Kamara | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Annemarie Munk | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD REES | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
GABRIELLE ANN BUNNING | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.89k | £31.72k | £21.14k | £59.37k | £46.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.60k | £30.39k | £20.70k | £58.08k | £46.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORNSBY HOUSE SCHOOL
HEARNVILLE ROAD
LONDON
SW12 8RS
- Phone:
- 07490556768
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window