Child Redress International

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child Redress seeks to advance the civil rights of child victims of sexual abuse in Southeast Asia by providing information, access to legal advice and building the capacities of national and local governments to promote and protect the welfare of child victims. Child Redress seeks to source suitable lawyers able to bring compensation claims on behalf of children in different jurisdictions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cambodia
- Philippines
- Thailand
- Vietnam
Governance
- 04 November 2016: CIO registration
- INTERNATIONAL CHILD REDRESS PROJECT (UK) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA DAY | Chair | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mable | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendi Warren Hill Binford | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RYAN MARSH | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shireen Irani | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KENNETH WOTHERSPOON | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LISA COX | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £8.19k | £1.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.17k | £296 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Nov 2016 as amended on 21 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION AND TO PROMOTE AWARENESS TO THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE SUBJECT OF CHILD SEXUAL EXPLOITATION (CSE) IN PARTICULAR THE REMEDIES THAT MAY BE AVAILABLE TO COMBAT CSE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION AND WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE. 3. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: * ADVOCACY FOR INDIVIDUAL CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION; * RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF CSE AS A HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; * MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION; * OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF CSE; * RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF CSE; * RESEARCH INTO CSE INCLUDING HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; * PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON CSE AND HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; * COMMENTING ON PROPOSED CSE AND HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; * RAISING AWARENESS OF CSE INCLUDING HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; * PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION; * PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; * INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION; AND * ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL EXPLOITATION. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS ABOVE BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Registered Office (Uk) Ltd
7 Bell Yard
LONDON
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- +66917040661
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window