NEW LONGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides and maintains a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the local areas for meetings, classes and various kinds of recreation and to support community life. Currently there are 14 groups and classes which meet regularly and on a weekly basis - throughout the day and in the evening.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 09 November 1978: Standard registration
- THE VILLAGE INSTITUTE FOR NEW LONGTON AND HUTTON (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Boulton | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Kay | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Rigby | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Johnson | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD KERSHAW | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Sharples Mrs | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hodgkinson | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jameson | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET KEARNS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.63k | £10.94k | £21.68k | £29.19k | £31.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.18k | £16.91k | £16.31k | £25.73k | £29.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 MAY 2001 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF NEW LONGTON AND HUTTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF NEW LONGTON AND HUTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 MOSSWAY
NEW LONGTON
PRESTON
PR4 4ZQ
- Phone:
- 01772616119
- Email:
- BERNARD.KERSHAW123@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window