EHSAS CARERS

Charity number: 1167640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support and assist carers of Asian and other ethnic minority communities in the Dudley borough, who provide unpaid care to family members with disabilities or additional needs, through the provision of accessible information, peer support, social and emotional help and services that will improve their quality of life; and through communication with policy makers & services that support carers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,475
Total expenditure: £3,126

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALEEM NAZ Chair 05 May 2016
None on record
GITABEN PATEL Trustee 05 May 2016
None on record
SHAZIA ZAMAN Trustee 05 May 2016
LYE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.35k £25.60k £2.55k £1.20k £1.48k
Total expenditure £2.79k £3.73k £3.62k £3.04k £3.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.58k £24.60k £1.50k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1-9 CHAPEL STREET
STOURBRIDGE
DY9 8BT
Phone:
01384422522
Website:

No information available