HOPE 4 PETS NORTH CYPRUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering of animals in need of care and attention in the Turkish Republic of North Cyprus. To educate the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare. To prevent cruelty and suffering to animals. To actively seek homes for rescued animals. To reduce the stray Dog & Cat population by means of neutering and rehoming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Turkey
Governance
- 21 October 2016: CIO registration
- H4P (Working name)
- HOPE 4 PETS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHANIE HARRISON-CROFT | Chair | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Orford Kirtley | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH KIRTLEY | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Eminsoy | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.01k | £43.22k | £83.36k | £58.57k | £40.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.28k | £47.36k | £67.88k | £57.25k | £47.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN THE TURKISH REPUBLIC OF NORTH CYPRUS. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE. TO PREVENT CRUELTY AND SUFFERING TO ANIMALS. TO ACTIVELY SEEK HOMES FOR RESCUED ANIMALS. TO REDUCE THE STRAY DOG & CAT POPULATION MY MEANS OF NEUTERING AND RE-HOMING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Mainspring Road
Wilsden
BRADFORD
BD15 0EH
- Phone:
- 01535274064
- Email:
- liz@hope4petsnorthcyprus.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window