Financial history UPTON JUNIOR FOOTBALL

Charity Number: 1172690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £69.27k £77.72k £90.42k £103.40k £134.33k
Total expenditure £73.14k £55.82k £100.34k £104.88k £123.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £3.00k £1.95k