KELLYDELI FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The KellyDeli Foundation aim is to advance and promote worldwide: 1) the relief of poverty or of those in need; 2) education, including the award of scholarships, maintenance allowances or grants or the provision of facilities for education in schools or other educational establishments; 3) health and wellbeing; 4) the protection of our environment;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Colombia
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Madagascar
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Spain
- Sweden
- Turkey
Governance
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.10k | £18.42k | £3.34k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.64k | £74.47k | £5.91k | £101.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2021 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2021 | 133 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 24 February 2020 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 24 February 2020 | 116 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 20 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2017
(These accounts |
20 March 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE "TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR, (WITHOUT LIMITATION), THE:- RELIEF OF POVERTY OR OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS OR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS; ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES; AND ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window