Financial history THE Y.D. CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1170619
Charity reporting is up to date (227 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £101.00k £165.00k £130.00k £192.14k £67.20k
Total expenditure £87.32k £159.91k £144.30k £194.15k £69.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A