Financial history SKOOL OF STREET

Charity number: 1167310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £109.81k £212.39k £177.78k £281.59k £240.82k
Total expenditure £70.33k £205.04k £210.52k £244.97k £234.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £105.78k £56.76k £52.13k £146.32k £156.73k