QUBA ISLAMIC & CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Prayer meetings - Festivals, Ramadan Iftar (Breakfast) and Eid parties - Program on Quran teaching - Islamic Awareness days Community Activity - Homework club. - Youth activities, Sports (Football, Badminton and other games). - Health seminars and consultations - Neighbourhood cohesion events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 July 2016: CIO registration
- QUBA ISLAMIC & CULTURAL CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAEED ALGHADIE | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SOLAYMAN HAMED | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|||||
JEMILA MARIOUF ABDU | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.97k | £133.11k | £176.29k | £234.43k | £365.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.03k | £124.26k | £167.55k | £217.63k | £296.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUBA ISLAMIC CENTRE
OLIVER STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B7 4NY
- Phone:
- 07846846716
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window