ST THOMAS'S CHAPEL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Subject to payment of management expenses to apply the income of the charity (1) in indemnifying the Trustees of the St Mary Magdalene and Holy Jesus Charity in respect of any liability arising out of the ownership or occupation of the Chapel of St Thomas,& in insuring in respect of any such liability & (2) subject thereto in paying the Master's remuneration and in repairing/maintaining the chapel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 14 July 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Very Revd Lee Batson | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Canon Richard Whaite | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Charge | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Elder | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Benjamin Doolan | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Peter Bowsher | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Lynne Edis | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Lawson | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ayris | Trustee | 02 November 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/04/2020 | 23/04/2021 | 23/04/2022 | 23/04/2023 | 23/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.61k | £12.77k | £13.17k | £15.67k | £15.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.50k | £14.85k | £12.70k | £4.77k | £4.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 April 2023 | 20 April 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 April 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 April 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24 APRIL 1978
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF MANAGEMENT EXPENSES TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY (I) IN INDEMNIFYING THE TRUSTEES OF THE ST MARY MAGDALENE AND HOLY JESUS CHARITY IN RESPECT OF ANY LIABILITY ARISING OUT OF THE OWNERSHIP OR OCCUPATION OF THE CHAPEL OF ST THOMAS, AND IN INSURING IN RESPECT OF ANY SUCH LIABILITY AND (II) SUBJECT THERETO IN PAYING THE MASTER'S REMUNERATION AND IN REPAIRING AND MAINTAINING THE CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINCOFFS LLP
5 OSBORNE TERRACE
nEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 1SQ
- Phone:
- 01912816151
- Email:
- TGRAY@MINCOFFS.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window