AYLESBURY VALE ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Regular Friday prayers for the whole community of Aylesbury and wider public - inviting speakers from local towns in the area 2. Regular Saturday evening classes explaining the key concepts of Islam to the community 3. Ramadan prayers in the evenings during the month of Ramadan for the whole community and wider public 4. Eid prayers to the whole community of Aylesbury and wider public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMIR ILYAS BSC, MSC, | Chair | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rory Anthony Jason Collymore | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MD Zahangir Allama | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.73k | £282.34k | £209.84k | £64.06k | £238.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.99k | £11.44k | £52.39k | £43.61k | £56.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 May 2016
Charitable objects
- THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC RELIGION. TO OUR AIM IS TO ADVANCE THE PURE TEACHINGS OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION BASED ON THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE PIOUS PREDECESSORS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH MANY MEANS INCLUDING EDUCATION (LECTURES, SEMINARS, CLASSES); AND PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND SACRED TEXTS TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS OF THE TEACHINGS. - TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AYLESBURY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, GENDER, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Matrix Travel Management
Unit 10
Chamberlain Road
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP19 8DY
- Phone:
- 07830072970
- Email:
- avic.masjid@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window