RHINO CONSERVATION BOTSWANA (UK) TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective of the charity is to promote the conservation, preservation and protection of species of wildlife which are in danger of extinction in the wild, particularly but not exclusively, rhinoceros. It aims to advance the education of the public in nature conservation and the protection of endangered animals. The charity operates in Botswana and liases with the Botswana government.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Botswana
Governance
- 03 June 2016: Standard registration
- 05 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.96k | £52.82k | £36.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.64k | £42.20k | £70.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 16 January 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | 16 January 2020 | 19 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO: PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF SPECIES OF WILDLIFE WHICH ARE IN DANGER OF EXTINCTION IN THE WILD, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, RHINOCEROS; AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN NATURE CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF ENDANGERED ANIMALS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, RHINOCEROS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF SUCH SUBJECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window