COMPTON DANDO PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Compton Dando Parish Hall is situated in the village of Compton Dando on Court Hill Road. The Compton Dando Community Association (CDCA) run quizes and coffee mornings. The Parish Hall is available to hire. Art classes and a table tennis club regularly take place in the Parish Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 01 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COMPTON DANDO PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.31k | £24.38k | £24.38k | £8.79k | £13.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.72k | £7.06k | £7.06k | £7.21k | £7.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.39k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 07 DEC 1955 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY HEREBY CONVEYED (HEREIN CALLED 'THE TRUST PROPERTY') SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF COMPTON DANDO IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE SAID PARISH') AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS ("OBJECTS").
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Kenilworth Drive
Willsbridge
BRISTOL
BS30 6UP
- Phone:
- 07746930582
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window