Financial history NEW DESTINY HORWICH

Charity number: 1168624
Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £18.02k £15.30k £566 £0 £0
Total expenditure £18.71k £10.98k £9.48k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.18k £9.18k N/A N/A N/A