ABALON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ABALON Trust act as ambassadors for Eye health and healthcare, providing access to high-quality eye-checks and ongoing care for marginalised communities in the commonwealth and the UK. We aim to become a leading voice in advocating for access to health for homeless, asylum seekers and BAME groups. We achieve this through engagement and involvement with stakeholders, innovation, education and train
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Barbados
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 03 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paidamoyo Andrea Nyika | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Wilson | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHARLES PIERCE | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yetunde Obadeyi | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADAM MAPANI | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.16k | £15.91k | £6.28k | £4.94k | £5.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.29k | £9.59k | £10.85k | £3.85k | £2.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 March 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 02 March 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH IN AFRICA AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BY A) THE PROVISION OF EYE CARE SERVICES TREATMENT, EQUIPMENT AND ADVICE TO VISUALLY IMPAIRED AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED INDIVIDUALS IN COLLABORATION WITH EYE CARE SPECIALISTS B) RAISING AWARENESS OF BASIC EYE CARE AND EYE HEALTH IN ORDER TO PREVENT VISUAL IMPAIRMENT OR BLINDNESS DUE TO LACK OF BASIC INFORMATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
4/4A BLOOMSBURY SQUARE
LONDON
GREATER LONDON
WC1A 2RP
- Phone:
- 02037780743
- Email:
- info@abalontrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window