DARTMOOR SKIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds public events such as talks and observing sessions; provides access to equipment such as telescopes and binoculars so that the public can enjoy views of planets, stars, galaxies and other objects in space for themselves; provides information and advise that enables the public to explore the night sky for themselves and provides facilities and access to open spaces for astronomy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alice May Taylor | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAX BURDETT | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAIN HUGH OZANNE MACLEOD | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.09k | £2.24k | £1.42k | £1.08k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.47k | £2.76k | £1.20k | £813 | £407 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £770 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PUBLIC EVENTS AND LECTURES, INCLUDING THE STAGING OF OBSERVATION SESSIONS AND THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF OBSERVATORIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 YEW TREE ROAD
DORKING
RH4 1NE
- Phone:
- 07771615648
- Email:
- info@dartmoorskies.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window