FRIENDS OF EAST MERU COMMUNITY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support an English medium Primary school in Tanzania by raising awareness and funds in order to complete the current building programme and to contribute to the day to day running costs, including the purchasing of food, uniforms, text books and other teaching materials, classroom furnishings and other ongoing community projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Tanzania
Governance
- 27 July 2016: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF EMCS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Michael Horne | Chair | 10 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Horne | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JON FORD | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA KEIGHLEY | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE WALL | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.77k | £20.46k | £16.87k | £23.44k | £17.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | £24.54k | £20.21k | £19.35k | £18.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF DISADVANTAGED FAMILIES IN THE MERU DISTRICT OF NORTHERN TANZANIA BY PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THE PROVISION OF AN ENGLISH MEDIUM PRIMARY EDUCATION AND ACCESS TO OTHER APPROPRIATE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. ADVANCING EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE DISADVANTAGED PRIMARY AGED CHILDREN IN THE MERU DISTRICT OF NORTHERN TANZANIA IN PARTICULAR BY RAISING AWARENESS AND RAISING FUNDS IN SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF EAST MERU COMMUNITY SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Gents Lane
Shimpling
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP29 4HP
- Phone:
- 07453453906
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window