REACH ONE TOUCH ONE MINISTRIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ROTOM UK is a Christian charity, supporting work globally that contributes to the empowerment and improvement of the lives of elderly people and their dependants physically, spiritually and emotionally. It also aims to increase the awareness of rights and needs of older persons worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Uganda
Governance
- 01 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIENNE SHAW | Chair | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Milton | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
AUSTIN AWADZI | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIM FOWLER | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.50k | £86.77k | £30.27k | £23.03k | £31.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.73k | £57.29k | £49.84k | £23.98k | £30.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR POOR HEALTH IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THE ELDERLY AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY, IN AFRICA AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN AFRICA AND SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN AFRICA AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
149 Cheltenham Road
EVESHAM
Worcestershire
WR11 2LF
- Phone:
- 07739544823
- Email:
- ashaw@reachone-touchone.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window