Accounts and annual returns BLOODHOUND EDUCATION LTD.

Charity number: 1167382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 01 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 17 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 17 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 23 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window