Financial history ASG COMMUNITY GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity Number: 1168783
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £168.40k £173.43k £232.57k £253.54k £300.58k
Total expenditure £188.49k £112.26k £185.94k £276.97k £278.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £79.94k £16.61k N/A N/A