MERCY 4 ALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity purpose, is the relief of financial need and suffering among victims of natural or other kinds of disaster in the form of money (or other means deemed suitable) for persons, bodies, organisations and/or countries affected. Mainly, though not exclusively, by arranging for the purchase and delivery of aid. The charity provides education by providing quran and other education material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YASIN PATEL | Chair | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Faruk Mohammed | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Munira Essop | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Siddique Ilyas Alli | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.98k | £170.77k | £50.82k | £117.83k | £198.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.47k | £139.84k | £65.83k | £96.38k | £232.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 May 2021 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 May 2021 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED. MAINLY, THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ARRANGING FOR THE PURCHASE AND DELIVERY OF AID TO SUCH AREAS; CO-OPERATING WITH OTHERS TO GET AID TO THE RIGHT PLACE; IDENTIFYING THE REAL NEEDS OF THOSE AFFECTED BY DISASTER AND WAYS OF MEETING THOSE NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mail Boxes Etc
City House
131 Friargate
PRESTON
PR1 2EF
- Phone:
- 07896661230
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window