Financial history PAST PUPILS ASSOCIATION - ILAVALAI CONVENT ( UK BRANCH)

Charity number: 1169271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.68k £2.37k £1.00k £8.05k £13.97k
Total expenditure £2.39k £2.47k £2.31k £6.04k £12.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A