BRITISH CONGENITAL CARDIAC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of health and education in all aspects of congenital cardiac diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 09 February 2017: CIO registration
- BCCA (Working name)
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Johann Andreas Hoschtitzky | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bethan Wilson | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.89k | £14.72k | £11.87k | £17.91k | £15.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.43k | £15.30k | £6.96k | £35.10k | £13.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2023 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2023 | 261 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 February 2022 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 February 2022 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2021 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2021 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Feb 2017 as amended on 28 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF CONGENITAL CARDIAC DISEASES IN PARTICULAR BY: • PROMOTING THE STUDY AND CARE OF THE FETUS AND CHILD WITH HEART DISEASES AND THE ADULT WITH CONGENITAL HEART DISEASE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND • PROMOTING AND DISTRIBUTE STUDY DATA PERTAINING TO THESE PROBLEMS AND THEIR PREVENTION • PROMOTING RESEARCH IN CONGENITAL CARDIOLOGY AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, AND • THE IMPROVEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE OF PROFESSIONALS, THE PUBLIC AND THE PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH SCIENTIFIC AND EDUCATIONAL MEETINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BCCA
c/o British Cardiovascular Society
9 Fitzroy Square
LONDON
W1T 5HW
- Phone:
- 020 7383 3887
- Email:
- bcca@bcs.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window