MORTIMER WEST END CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN HAMPSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 13 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcia Ripley | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MORRIS | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MARK DAVID KENNEDY | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK ALUN JENKINS | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.56k | £38.97k | £35.12k | £41.21k | £79.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.02k | £31.50k | £34.40k | £28.73k | £80.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN HAMPSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLVIEW
POST OFFICE LANE
BURGHFIELD
READING
RG30 3TL
- Phone:
- 01189701899
- Email:
- SECRETARY@THECHAPEL.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window