Financial history HEALTHWATCH NORTH YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1171152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £160.72k £167.46k £185.06k £237.42k £196.83k
Total expenditure £170.23k £135.00k £172.13k £252.31k £237.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £142.46k £167.46k £185.06k £232.46k £189.17k