Financial history GOODNEWS CHURCH, MELKSHAM CIO

Charity Number: 1167992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.42k £45.72k £41.76k £49.49k £45.99k
Total expenditure £42.97k £53.15k £50.18k £53.80k £54.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k £1.00k £200