Accounts and annual returns RADNOR PRIMARY PTA

Charity number: 1167413
Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 October 2022 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 October 2021 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 October 2021 478 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required