Accounts and annual returns CHANGING LIVES FOREVER (CLF)

Charity number: 1169224
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 20 February 2025 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 20 February 2025 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 09 May 2024 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 09 May 2024 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 27 May 2023 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 27 May 2023 111 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 April 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 April 2022 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 March 2021 53 days late Download Open in new window