CHANGING LIVES FOREVER (CLF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Changing Lives Forever (CLF) has been operating a Soup Kitchen in Luton town centre feeding the homeless we open every Tuesday and Thursday from 18.30 to 19.30 CLF Food bank started on the 17-11-2016 from a Trailer in the town centre every Thursday evening from 18.30 to 19.30. We know do two nights a week and one Saturday per month.. we are looking for more donations Food, Cloth, and Money.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 16 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KERRYANN SPENCER | Chair | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MCKINLEY | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.11k | £255.11k | £256 | £2.38k | £264 | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.71k | £228.17k | £0 | £2.74k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 May 2023 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 May 2023 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2020
(These accounts |
30 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE LUTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS: (1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING PERSONS WITH FOOD AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING COMMUNITY EDUCATION CENTRES, LIBRARIES AND FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES. (3) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY: PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (4) TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH INHABITANTS OF LUTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR POVERTY OR A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC TRANSPORT SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Luton Irish Forum
102 Hitchin Road
LUTON
LU2 0ES
- Phone:
- 07804651962
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window