Financial history BRIGHT FUTURES UK

Charity Number: 1168039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £94.93k £157.00k £193.42k £221.21k £244.75k
Total expenditure £83.16k £156.11k £201.37k £232.88k £245.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A