THE THAI BUDDHIST SOUTH WEST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust operates in the South West of England and provides spiritual support to the The Buddhist community via religious festivals and events held throughout the year and the provision of a permanent home or temple with resident monks where spiritual support can be provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHATSAKORN KOTA | Chair | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gwenlan | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|||||
ANDREW COLIN THREADER | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD GEORGE PRINGLE | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.02k | £32.67k | £198.78k | £98.68k | £85.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.51k | £27.53k | £21.81k | £41.58k | £38.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE THERAVADA BUDDHIST FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND AND BEYOND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. ESTABLISHING A PERMANENT TEMPLE WHERE THE DHAMMA CAN BE STUDIED AND TAUGHT AND WHERE MEDITATION CAN BE PRACTISED. 2. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO BUDDHIST MONKS AND NUNS IN THEIR STUDIES AND PASTORAL DUTIES. 3. OFFERING RELIGIOUS AND SPIRITUAL SUPPORT TO THE BUDDHIST AND NON-BUDDHIST LAITY. 4. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THERAVADA BUDDHISM AND THAI CULTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berkeley House
14A Berkeley Gardens
Keynsham
BRISTOL
BS31 2PN
- Phone:
- 0117 329 5988
- Email:
- infotbstuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window