WORKSOP CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek the advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Faith; and the provisions of facilities for recreation and other leisure-time occupation for the inhabitants of Worksop and the surrounding area in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 October 2016: CIO registration
- WCC (Working name)
- WCC-LIFE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Joanne Bladen | Chair | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Leslie Wilds | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Lee | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joel Thomas Hatfield | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.12k | £97.05k | £87.96k | £47.12k | £31.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.51k | £78.92k | £118.63k | £52.36k | £29.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £200 | £25.00k | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2016 as amended on 01 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH AS DESCRIBED IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH; 4.2. THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF WORKSOP AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORKSOP CHRISTIAN CENTRE
VICARS WALK
WORKSOP
S80 2HJ
- Phone:
- 01909489521
- Email:
- admin@wcc-church.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window