Trustees NEW TYNESIDE ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 508234

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Ruth Beyer | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Sarah Eyre | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Walters | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Annette Nicolle | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Brian Tanner | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty McDowell | Trustee | 03 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RICHARD MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIRSTY ELIZABETH BRAMWELL PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.