STEP BY STEP (WALES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Step by Step (Wales) operates a gardening and clearance business as well as a Charity Shop to provide employment and training to those with addictions, ex-offenders or those who just need help to get back into work. The Charity also runs Church Services, Bible study and occasional fundraising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CARL ROBERTS | Chair | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Derek Murphy | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Elaine Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leonard William Lewis | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Kennedy | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
NESTA GRIFFITHS-MICHAEL | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE ROBERTS | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.30k | £151.21k | £152.84k | £102.15k | £139.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.39k | £143.65k | £158.68k | £109.98k | £143.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £75.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF CHURCH SERVICES, HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, RUNNING COURSES AND WORKING ALONGSIDE PEOPLE. 2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF WORK WHERE AVAILABLE (INCLUDING VOLUNTARY WORK), GIVING ASSISTANCE IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT AND OFFERING EDUCATION, SKILLS TRAINING AND COUNSELLING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 St. Helens Road
SWANSEA
West Glamorgan
SA1 4AP
- Phone:
- 07513 166665
- Email:
- info@stepbystepwales.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window