BEDEAU HERITAGE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bedeau Heritage Foundation seeks to raise funds to relieve financial hardship among people living and working in the UK: advance the eduction of those in full-time education, in employment and promote learning: to help the young by engaging in leisure time activities. we are currently engaged in raising funds in order to achieve these objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 February 2017: CIO registration
- 11 February 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 11 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1046631 THE SICKLE CELL SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £920 | £350 | £330 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AROUND THE WORLD BY GIVING SUCH PERSONS GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF THOSE IN FULL-TIME EDUCATION, IN EMPLOYMENT AND PROMOTE LEARNING TO THOSE WHO ARE NO LONGER IN FULL-TIME EMPLOYMENT BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS TO PURSUE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THEIR EDUCATION. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window