Accounts and annual returns Magic Makers

Charity Number: 1168797
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 March 2025 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 March 2025 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 March 2025 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 March 2025 408 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late Download Open in new window