Financial history Magic Makers

Charity Number: 1168797
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.09k £1.65k £41.71k £53.84k £55.25k
Total expenditure £15.07k £562 £40.60k £29.76k £71.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A