EAST LONDON & ESSEX LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objectives of the synagogue is to further the advancement of Liberal Judaism. It provides a place of worship, provides rabbinical services, arranges conversions to Judaism, the solemnisation of marriages and funerals to members. It provides a religion school for children and adult education and a friendship club for senior members and the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Redbridge
Governance
- 23 January 2017: Standard registration
- 28 March 2022: Funds received from 283547 BET TIKVAH SYNAGOGUE
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARCO LIEBESKIND | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BARNETT | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Isaac Daniel Garfield | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Nigel Dawson | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Joseph Baum | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Muscovitch | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Harvey Green | Trustee | 26 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA NEWHAM | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
TINA GOLD | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.00k | £223.05k | £235.99k | £242.57k | £262.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.43k | £233.25k | £251.10k | £270.69k | £251.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 JAN 2017 as amended on 03 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF LIBERAL JUDAISM AND, FOR SUCH PURPOSES, TO BE AFFILIATED TO THE UNION OF LIBERAL JUDAISM (FORMERLY KNOWN AS THE UNION OF LIBERAL AND PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marlborough Road
South Woodford
London
E18 1AR
- Phone:
- 02089897619
- Email:
- administrator@elels.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window