Financial history POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN DARLINGTON

Charity number: 1168672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.33k £14.58k £20.22k £24.05k £25.94k
Total expenditure £23.86k £16.37k £18.32k £21.35k £25.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A