POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN DARLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Polish Saturday School has been established in 2016. Its purpose is to advance education for the public benefit in Polish language, culture, tradition and history. School focus its activities on providing teaching about Poland, the Polish language, history, geography, Polish customs, traditions and also organizing various cultural events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
Governance
- 09 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZBIGNIEW KRAWIEC | Chair | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Agnieszka Palucha | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Piotr Urban | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Agnieszka Kindel | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ewelina Mozdyniewicz | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Agata Wieckiewicz | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.33k | £14.58k | £20.22k | £24.05k | £25.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.86k | £16.37k | £18.32k | £21.35k | £25.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; TO ADVANCE CULTURE AND HERITAGE; AND TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY IN PARTICULAR BY: A) ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND DEVELOPING THE POLISH SCHOOL IN DARLINGTON AND BY PROVIDING RESOURCES AND TEACHING WHERE NECESSARY TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ITS PUPILS/THE CHILDREN; B) ASSISTING PUPILS/CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL (AND THEIR FAMILIES) INTEGRATE INTO THE LOCAL CULTURAL ENVIRONMENT AND BRITISH SOCIETY; C) HELPING CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL TO SUSTAIN THEIR OWN CULTURAL IDENTITY AND BY ENSURING POLISH CULTURAL HERITAGE IS HANDED DOWN FOR THE BENEFIT OF FUTURE GENERATIONS AND FOR POSTERITY; AND BY D) NURTURING POLISH CULTURE, TRADITIONS AND VALUES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE PSS FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Polish Catholic Mission
2 Maple Terrace
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 7SF
- Phone:
- 07912060992
- Website:
-
polishschooldrlington.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window