Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF LEEN MILLS PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1167604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 01 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 08 January 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 14 December 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 03 December 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required